judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. COOPER, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0308
Short Caption:JAMES E. COOPER, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5157-86Filed Date:03/20/1987

Opening Event Date:03/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames E. Cooper, Jr.N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig S. Iscoe YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COOPER JR., JAMES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100687 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 02 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE INDI- NOTE - 03 CATING THE DATE THE ADDITIONAL NOTE - 03 RT WAS ORDERED & THE STATUS OF NOTE - 04 THE PENDING MO FOR RT. NOTE - 04
03/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 033087 SCHPRD CHECK
05/22/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD DSA
05/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL TW PANEL SCDATE 051987 SCHPRD R
06/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (273 PGS - SALAZAR) PB PANEL SCDATE 052087 SCHPRD RT
06/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 3RD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
07/23/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/3/87. NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AFTER RECEIPT OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 090387 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/03/1987ORDER DENY MO FOR RT AS MOOT; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102987 SCHPRD CHECK
02/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (96 PGS - ALLISON) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BA
04/04/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD V
05/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 052588 SCHPRD BE
06/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 062388 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD