judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LA PRADE, SHERRILL A. D.C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS

Case Information: 87-BG-1460
Short Caption:LA PRADE, SHERRILL A. D.C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONSClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/30/1987

Opening Event Date:12/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
David R. Andrews NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Lloyd N. Moore NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LA PRADE, SHERRILL A. D.C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS
12/30/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & LLOYD MOORE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988ORDER HOLD IN ABEYANCE PEND CONS OF COA'S RECOMMENDATION RE: RULE 46(c)(3)(ii)(b). ebp PANELMKFE SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD RBH
04/22/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/22/1988ORDER SS, REMANDING CASE TO COA. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050188 SCHPRD CHECK
04/22/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
02/27/1992RECEIVED ATTACHMENT TO MMP FILED 2/14/92 FOR RE-APP. OF COUNSEL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD