judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REILLY, NOEL C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS

Case Information: 87-BG-1392
Short Caption:REILLY, NOEL C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONSClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions
Lead: 87-BG-1037 Consolidated:87-BG-1392, 88-BG-0116 , 89-BG-0050
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/16/1987

Opening Event Date:12/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNoel Christopher NPro SeN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Adrian L. Steel NN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Robert M. Clark YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Jerome Nelson YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Lloyd N. Moore NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REILLY, NOEL C. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-1037, 88-116 & 89-50 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 021789 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO IN NOTE - 02 89-50 TO CONS W/87-1037, NOTE - 03 87-1392 & 88-116; GRANT APLT NOTE - 03 MO FOR LV TO FILE BR IN 89-50; NOTE - 04 COA MAY FILE A RESPONSIVE BR NOTE - 04 W/IN 30 DAYS & CLK TO SCHED ON NOTE - 05 CAL FOR ARG AS SOON AS THE BIZ NOTE - 05 OF THE CAL PERMITS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/09/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - TEAREP FOR - pro se ATTY 2 - CLARKRO FOR - PETR REILLY ATTY 3 - STEELA FOR - PETITIONERS TRDATE- 89/09/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KADZIKP FOR - PETR GUERRA ATTY 2 - NELSONJE FOR - RESPONDENT
01/01/1906 CLARKRO FOR ARGUEMENT
12/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/16/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & LLOYD MOORE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS PB PANEL SCDATE 122888 SCHPRD DSA
02/09/1988RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1988ORDER 87-1037, 87-1392 & 88-116 CONS APLTS TO FILE BRS IN 30 DAYS & COA BR DUE 30 THEREAFT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD VS
11/23/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN 88-116 (AL-ATHARI) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN 87-1037 (TEARE) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/04/1989RESPONDENT'S BRIEF COA BRIEF. EBP PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1989PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF OF NOEL C REILLY. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF OF ABDUL MUSHIN NOUR AL-ATHARI EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989PETITIONER'S BRIEF OF COIQUAD-GUERRA (89-50) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD T
05/08/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989ORDER GRT MOTION TO SCHEDULE THESE CASES AS SOON AS THE CAL. PER- MITS. PB PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD OPE
09/01/1989APPEARANCE OF ADRIAN L. STEEL JR. ON BEHALF OF ABDUL MUNSHIN NOUR AL-ATHARI AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 9/8/89 CITATION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPEARANCE FOR APLT -ROBERT M. CLARK AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1989APPEARANCE OF JEROME NELSON AS COUNSEL FOR COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO ESUBSITUTE COUNSEL IN 89-50. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD VS
09/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/18/1989ARGUED PANELNWSTFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 9/22/89 LTR OF PTNR IN 88-116 TO DIVISION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/03/1989DENIED OPINION DENYING PETITION TO WAIVE REQUIREMENT OF RULE 46 (c)(3)(ii) PANELNWSTFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - D METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
11/03/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 2704