Case: 04-03-00832-CV
04-03-00832-CV
11/04/2003
Summary Judgment
Kristin Terk Belt and Kimberly Terk Murphy, Joint Independent Executrixes of the Estate of David B. Terk, Deceased
Oppenheimer, Blend, Harrison & Tate, Inc., Glen A. Yale, J. David Oppenheimer and Kenneth M. Gindy
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/27/2013 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/12/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/30/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/06/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
05/23/2006 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/05/2006 | Higher Court Decision | COURT APPEALS REVERSED/REMANDED TO TRIAL COURT | |
06/10/2005 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/08/2005 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/27/2004 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
12/17/2004 | Information regarding cause received | | |
09/16/2004 | Information regarding cause received | | |
07/29/2004 | Information regarding cause received | | |
06/16/2004 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/11/2004 | Submitted | | |
04/05/2004 | Submission | | |
03/08/2004 | Brief Filed | | |
03/08/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/08/2004 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
02/19/2004 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/18/2004 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/05/2004 | Motion f/l/file Amended Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/29/2004 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
01/29/2004 | Motion f/l/file Amended Brief Filed | | |
01/29/2004 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
01/29/2004 | Amended Brief Received | | |
01/23/2004 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
01/23/2004 | Brief Filed | | |
01/23/2004 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |
01/22/2004 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
12/24/2003 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
11/04/2003 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
11/04/2003 | Information regarding cause received | | |
11/04/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
11/04/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/03/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/23/2003 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/27/2013 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Oppenheimer, Blend, Harrison & Tate, Inc., et al. | Appellee | David M. Winters David Stephenson Mark J. Cannan |
Kristin Terk Belt, et al. | Appellant | Barry Snell |
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Laura Salinas
2003-CI-04682