judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LONG, KEITH UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1346
Short Caption:LONG, KEITH UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15526-85Filed Date:09/05/1986

Opening Event Date:09/05/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
W. Eric Cloud YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas T. Ruffin, Jr.NY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John M. Seabright YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LONG, KEITH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 012788 ORD: VACATE APPTMENT OF NOTE - 01 W. ERIC CLOUD & APPT THOMAS NOTE - 02 RUFFIN, JR. TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 02 ON APPEAL; REFER W. ERIC CLOUD NOTE - 03 TO THE BPR W/RESPECT TO THIS NOTE - 03 MATTER FOR APPROPRIATE ACTION; NOTE - 04 FORMER COUNSEL TO TRANSMIT ALL NOTE - 04 PAPERS INCLUDING RT TO NEWLY NOTE - 05 APPTD COUNSEL; APLT BRF DUE IN NOTE - 05 40 DAYS. NOTE - 06 020588 ORDER: VACATE 1/27/88 NOTE - 06 ORDER; VACATE APPOINTMENT OF NOTE - 07 THOMAS RUFFIN. JR., ESQ. & RE- NOTE - 07 APPOINT W. ERIC CLOUD, ESQ., NOTE - 08 AS COUNSEL FOR APLT; FO: CLK NOTE - 08 TO FILE LDGD APLT BR & APLE NOTE - 09 BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 09
01/01/1904JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1906 CLOUDW RE-APPOINTED PER 2/5/88 ORDER RUFFINT VACATED PER 2/5/88 ORDER
09/05/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/03/1986RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 110486 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. ERIC CLOUD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 121586 SCHPRD CHECK
10/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (343 PGS - HUNT) MLH PANEL SCDATE 010287 SCHPRD RT
10/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112487 SCHPRD BA
12/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 5TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 012287 SCHPRD CHECK
01/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD DDW
02/05/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 09. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
02/09/1988LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL THOMAS RUFFIN JR. RE: APPOINTMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 7TH (NO OPA) MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD BE
10/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD