judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAMS, NATHANIEL UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1285
Short Caption:WILLIAMS, NATHANIEL UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15859-84Filed Date:09/02/1986

Opening Event Date:09/02/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jonathan S. ZuckerNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, NATHANIEL a/k/a WILBUR JOHNSON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 RELATED CASES: 83-118-DISMSD, NOTE - 01 83-101-DISMSD.
09/02/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JONATHAN ZUCKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 110386 SCHPRD R
11/17/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (40 PGS - LINNENKAMP) PB PANEL SCDATE 120486 SCHPRD RT
11/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/19/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT (M-19)RJG PANEL SCDATE 122986 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT FL A STATEMENT IN 10 DAYS RE STATUS OF RT. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 123186 SCHPRD OPE
09/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (133 PGS - GLEASON) PB PANEL SCDATE 090387 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 12TH COURT ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT (INCLUDED) JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD STATE
10/14/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987ORDER APLT OTSC IN 10 DAYS WHY APPL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD CHECK
02/26/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/26/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DENY MO TO W/DRAW AS COUNSEL AS MOOT. ACG PANELMKFE SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD VS
02/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
03/18/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD