Case Information: 40781 | |||
Short Caption: | GONZALES (ARMANDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44018 , 44904 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3893 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/14/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-00725 | |
02/03/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/15/02 and 7/25/02. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. | 03-01831 | |
02/24/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 3, 2003. | 03-02964 | |
03/03/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-03476 | |
03/24/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Appellant to File Fast Track Statement. | 03-04985 | |
03/26/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 3, 2003. Appellant shall have to and including April 2, 2003, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 03-05090 | |
04/07/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-05761 | |
04/07/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 3. | 03-05762 | |
04/23/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-06931 | |
06/06/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-09483 | |
07/01/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-09992 | |
07/01/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/31/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 7, 2003. | 03-09992 |