judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UTZ, CHARLES UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1282
Short Caption:UTZ, CHARLES UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5258-86Filed Date:08/15/1986

Opening Event Date:08/15/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/27/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ethel Schindler YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Claire M. Fay YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UTZ, CHARLES UNITED STATES
08/15/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ETHEL SCHINDLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 101486 SCHPRD R
11/25/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (28 PGS - SWAGERTY) PB PANEL SCDATE 122286 SCHPRD RT
12/04/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD BA
04/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (72 PGS - HUNT) PB PANEL SCDATE 020987 SCHPRD RT
04/27/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD BA
07/01/1987ORDER GRT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE APLT'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD OPE
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 090387 SCHPRD BE
10/06/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 16TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD BE
10/19/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD OPA
10/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 30, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL REPLY BRF. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 121387 SCHPRD OPE
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD