Case: 06-08-00008-CV
06-08-00008-CV
01/14/2008
Other Personal Injury
Rigdon Marine Corporation
Bobby Roberts, Jr.
No
12th Court of Appeals
01/14/2008
12-07-00470-CV
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/15/2008 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
07/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
04/03/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/15/2017 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
05/13/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/03/2009 | Petition for review disposed by Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
01/26/2009 | Petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
12/29/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/29/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
11/24/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/21/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
10/07/2008 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/10/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
08/15/2008 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
08/05/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/01/2008 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
07/31/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed | | |||||
07/07/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/07/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
07/01/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/27/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/06/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/05/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/05/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/03/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
03/13/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/11/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/11/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
01/15/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
01/14/2008 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
01/14/2008 | Case stored | | |||||
01/14/2008 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||
01/08/2008 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||||
01/04/2008 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||||
01/02/2008 | Confidential Mediation Questionnaire Filed | | |||||
12/28/2007 | No Description Available. | | |||||
12/17/2007 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||||
12/17/2007 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
12/17/2007 | Welcome to the court letter | | |||||
12/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
10/15/2007 | Motion for New Trial Filed w/Trial Court | | |||||
09/14/2007 | No Description Available. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/13/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/15/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rigdon Marine Corporation | Appellant | Robert J. Killeen Jr. David W. Holman Robert C. Stern Hon. Christopher M. Raney |
Roberts, Jr., Bobby | Appellee | Hon. Russell R. Smith Hon. C. Elaine Howard Hon. Alan B. Daughtry Hon. Michael P. Doyle Hon. James M. Yakovsky |
Trial Court Information
273rd District Court
San Augustine
Honorable Charles R. Mitchell
CV 06-8843