Case Information: 44667 | |||
Short Caption: | RIOS (ARTURO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041432 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-02759 | |
02/11/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 7, 2004 and January 27, 2005. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. Filed in district court on: no file-stamp. | 05-02849 | |
02/15/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/7/04 and 1/27/05. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. | 05-03023 | |
03/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-05551 | |
04/05/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 22, 2005. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-06666 | |
04/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time in Which to File Appeal. | 05-07963 | |
04/27/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 22, 2005. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 05-08269 | |
05/16/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-09514 | |
05/16/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-09515 | |
06/02/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-10849 | |
06/02/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 05-10850 | |
07/21/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-14444 | |
08/16/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-14560 | |
08/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/25/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2005. | 05-14560 |