judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HALL, OSCAR UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1425
Short Caption:HALL, OSCAR UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6045-86Filed Date:09/30/1986

Opening Event Date:09/30/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/04/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/31/1987
Argued/Submitted:01/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/24/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Roger C. Wesley YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HALL, OSCAR UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: FRANCIS WILLIAMS NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/01/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WESLEYR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SPRAGUES FOR - APPELLEE
09/30/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/04/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/04/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 120186 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (484 PGS - TANNER) JB PANEL SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NO BRIEF. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050687 SCHPRD BA
05/26/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 5/14/87 & FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD STATE
06/02/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD APLT'S BR; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD OPE
06/30/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 30TH (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 070287 SCHPRD BE
07/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 11TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987ORDER GRANT APLE'S MOS FOR EXTS TO FILE BR; APLE'S BR DUE BY 8/11 NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD CHECK
08/12/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 081187 SCHPRD BE
08/12/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (14 PGS - WRAY) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987FiledBriefing Completed
08/31/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1987LETTER GRANT REQUEST FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 1/5/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD OPE
01/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1988ARGUED PANELTERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/24/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD