Case Information: 44666 | |||
Short Caption: | MILLER (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42473 , 46290 , 51347 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C194811 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/28/2005 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-02757 | |
02/24/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log. The attorney general shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the notice of appeal log maintained at the prison indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered to a prison official his notice of appeal. If the notice of appeal log does not indicate that appellant delivered this notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. | 05-03726 | |
03/10/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Deputy Attorney General Heather D. Proctor. | 05-04866 | |
03/28/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court Order. | 05-06009 | |
04/08/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] | 05-06921 | |
04/28/2005 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 05-08433 | |
04/28/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/16/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Remand for Entry of an Amended Judgment of Conviction. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to further relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED AND REMAND the matter for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-11842 | |
07/12/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-12781 | |
07/12/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/22/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2005. | 05-12781 |