judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. MORRIS JOHNSON

Case Information: 86-CM-1424
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. MORRIS JOHNSONClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3627-86Filed Date:10/06/1986

Opening Event Date:10/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/25/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles M. Steele YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Howard F. Bramson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES JOHNSON, MORRIS
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030387 ORD: GRANT MO TO NOTE - 01 EXPEDITE; APLT BRF DUE 3/23/87 NOTE - 02 & APLE BRF DUE 4/22/87; CLERK NOTE - 02 TO SCHD FOR CONS ON MAY CALNDR
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/06/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STEELECH FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BRAMSONH FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HOWARD F. BRAMSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 120586 SCHPRD R
02/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (83 PGS - SCHERTZER) GG PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD RT
02/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
02/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL THE APPEAL IN accordance with DC CODE $ 23-104(e) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD BA
03/03/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1987FiledBriefing Completed
04/22/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042287 SCHPRD BE
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AND APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1987ORDER SS, CASE IS RESCHED FOR ORAL ARG ON REG CAL ON 6/25/87 AT 1:30 P.M. DAS PANELMKROST SCDATE 060287 SCHPRD CREG
06/25/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/25/1987ARGUED PANELMKRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1987APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO (SUPPLEMENTAL ATTACHED) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987ORDER GRANTG APLE'S MO FOR LV TO FL SUPP MEMO; CLK TO FILE ATTCHMT TO APLE'S MO AS A SUPP MEMO.CC PANELMKROST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM (ATTACHMENT TO APLE'S MO FOR LV TO FILE SUPP MEMO) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF/RV IN PART... CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELMKRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 540 A.2d 1090
04/15/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0633 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0000
04/29/1988PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988ORDER APLT W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE (10 COPIES) TO PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC MLH PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD ANSA
06/21/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HOWARD F. BRAMSON, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN THE SUPREME COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE TO RECLAIM THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITIONTO MOTION TO RECLAIM THE MANDATE JB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPA
09/20/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECLAIM THE MANDATE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV & CLK TO FL OPPO TO MO TO RECALL MAN DATE;MO TO RECALL MANDT DENIED PANELMKROST SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD OPE
09/27/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECLAIM MANDATE FILED 9/7/88. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD