Case Information: 44656 | |||
Short Caption: | ZUNIGA VS. FLORIDA CANYON MINE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0400527A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2005 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-02628 | |
02/11/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/22/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on the Settlement Judge. | 05-03530 | |
02/24/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 05-03667 | |
05/05/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 05-08864 | |
05/11/2005 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 05-09242 | |
06/23/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
06/30/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 05-13006 | |
08/04/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 8, 2005. | 05-15491 | |
08/29/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 05-17160 | |
09/06/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed August 29, 2005. Appellant shall have until October 10, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. | 05-17490 | |
10/07/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Settlement. | 05-19916 | |
11/18/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulated Agreement and General Release. | 05-22845 | |
02/16/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 06-03430 | |
02/16/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |