judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANKLIN, VERNON T. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1366
Short Caption:FRANKLIN, VERNON T. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1642-85Filed Date:09/08/1986

Opening Event Date:09/08/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/12/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/05/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen D. ScavuzzoYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edith S. Marshall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRANKLIN, VERNON T. AKA YUSUF A. MALIK UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SCAVUZZOS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MARSHALLE FOR - APPELLEE
09/08/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/12/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/12/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 110786 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN SCAVUZZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (257 PGS - JACKSON) PB PANEL SCDATE 051587 SCHPRD RT
01/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 123086 SCHPRD RT
03/24/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD BA
03/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BA
03/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (17 PGS -- ARTIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD V
05/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/16/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD BE
06/14/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF (RECEIVED -- NOT FILED) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1989ARGUED PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989REVERSED AND REMANDED JDGMT RV JDGMTS OF CONVICTION/ CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 555 A.2d 1010
03/17/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0423
04/07/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD