judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ODUYEBO, ADEMOLA M. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION

Case Information: 87-AA-1323
Short Caption:ODUYEBO, ADEMOLA M. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Taxicab Commission
Lead: 87-AA-1322 Consolidated:87-AA-1323, 87-AA-1324 , 87-AA-1327 , 87-AA-1400 , 87-AA-1424
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/30/1987

Opening Event Date:11/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/23/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Edward F. Kearney YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ODUYEBO, ADEMOLA M. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030788 ORDER: GRANT MOS FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO FILE RECORDS IN 87-1324, NOTE - 02 87-1400 & 87-1424; FO: SS, CON NOTE - 02 87-1322, 87-1323, 87-1324, NOTE - 03 87-1341, 87-1400 & 87-1424, & NOTE - 03 APLE IN 15 DAYS TO FILE RECORD NOTE - 04 IN 87-1322, 87-1323 & 87-1341. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 87-1322, 87-1324, 87-1400 NOTE - 05 CON 87-1424 NOTE - 06 5/13/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF PETNR NOTE - 06 TO SEVER 87-1341 FROM 87-1322, NOTE - 07 1323, 1324, 1400, & 1424; BRF NOTE - 07 OF PTNR IN 87-1341 DUE BY NOTE - 08 6/6/88; BRF OF RESP IN 87-1322 NOTE - 08 1323, 1324, 1400 & 1424 DUE NOTE - 09 BY 6/8/88. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KEARNEYE FOR - PETITIONER ATTY 2 - BROOKINSC FOR - RESPONDENT
11/30/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD DSA
01/29/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD DSA
03/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD R
03/23/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD R
03/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1988ORDER APLTS' BRIEFS DUE W/IN 4O DAYS EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD BA
04/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DECONSOLIDATE CASE #87-1341 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
05/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD OPE
05/31/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/11/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD BE
07/11/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 13, 1988 GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
07/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF APLE IN 87-1341 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/05/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF PTNRS TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL DOCUMENTS SPECIFD IN PTNR'S MO AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD TRAFFIC TICKETS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/13/1989ARGUED PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE
05/12/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 1005
06/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD