Case Information: 46595 | |||
Short Caption: | ERRICO VS. DIST. CT. (FARELLA) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48107 , 48948 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A504063 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/17/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael R. Pontoni, Ltd.--check no. 4671. | ||
01/17/2006 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 06-01051 | |
01/23/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of petition on Judge Nancy Saitta. | 06-01620 | |
01/24/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Respondent Judge Nancy M. Saitta and real party in interest Tania Farella shall each have 5 days to file an answer against issuance of the requested writ. | 06-01768 | |
01/30/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Petition. Petitioner William K. Errico's Withdrawal and Cancellation of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 06-02196 | |
02/13/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Petition. Petitioner has filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw his petition. We grant the motion and " . . . dismiss the petition." fn1[The parties shall bear their own costs and fees, if any.] We vacate our January 24, 2006 order directing answers. SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-03075 | |
02/13/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued. |