judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREENWOOD'S TRANSFER & D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1349
Short Caption:GREENWOOD'S TRANSFER & D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/04/1987

Opening Event Date:12/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Dorsey Evans NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Susan S. Mcdonald YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREENWOOD'S TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY, INC. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES ( WORKER'S COMP.)
12/04/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AN ORDER OF THE D.C. DEPT. OF EMPLY SERV.(WORKER'S COMP.) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD DSA
02/09/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD DSA
03/02/1988APPELLANT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/04/1988APPELLEE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER REPS DIR TO FL REC IN 20 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 122987 SCHPRD R
04/14/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD R
04/20/1988RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD CHECK
05/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/13/1988ORDER GRT RESPONDENT MO FO LV TO FL RECORD; CLK TO FL RECORD; PET. BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD V
05/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 062288 SCHPRD BA
07/25/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/25/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072788 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE
02/17/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0277
03/23/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD