Case Information: 46596 | |||
Short Caption: | PLANTAN VS. LEKAR | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45908 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A492687 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/24/2006 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/17/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Jeffrey A. Cogan, Chartered--check no. 5914. | ||
01/17/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-01054 | |
01/24/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Howard Roitman . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/14/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | ||
02/27/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Stay Appeal on the Ground that it is Premature. | 06-04477 | |
05/23/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We conclude that leave to file a motion for stay of appeal is not warranted. We deny appellant's motion to Stay Appeal on the Ground that it is Premature. Docketing Statement due: 10 days. We caution appellant that failure to file a docketing statement my result in sanctions. | 06-10784 | |
06/02/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-11564 | |
07/10/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 06-14131 | |
07/19/2006 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 06-14977 | |
07/26/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 06-15548 | |
08/10/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 06-16693 | |
08/18/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. As we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." Once the district court enters a final, written order, appellant may appeal if he is aggrieved. NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-17223 | |
09/12/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-17516 | |
09/12/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/19/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2006. | 06-17516 |