judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BLANDFORD, ROBERT D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1393
Short Caption:BLANDFORD, ROBERT D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/17/1987

Opening Event Date:12/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRobert Blandford NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
N. Denise Wilson-Taylor YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLANDFORD, ROBERT D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
12/17/1987PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD R
02/19/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (PRO SE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF PETNR & CLK TO FL BRF OF PETNR;BRF OF RESP DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1988APPELLANT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLEE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1988ORDER SS, CASE REMOVED FROM STLMNT CONF OF 3/24/88; BRF OF RESP DUE BY 4/14/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/18/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 14, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD BE
05/11/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/14/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD V
06/28/1988ORDER APLE IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE CALENDARED ON REC & APLT BR ALONE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051488 SCHPRD BE
07/05/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 6/28/88 ORDER AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD ANSE
07/25/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/25/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD