Case Information: 40763 | |||
Short Caption: | WATKINS (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36793 , 45491 , 58341 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123636 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/09/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/09/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-00474 | |
02/05/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-02024 | |
02/27/2003 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-03280 | |
03/25/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-03394 | |
03/25/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/03/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 24, 2003. | 03-03394 | |
04/03/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On February 5, 2003, this court dismissed this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. On February 27, 2003, this court denied appellant's petition for rehearing. On March 7, 2003, this court received a proper person document entitled, "status check for needed material," requesting that this court send him copies of transcripts and inform him what claims this court has denied. No good having been show, appellant[s request is hereby denied. | 03-05641 |