judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYLER, THOMAS LEE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPT. OF

Case Information: 87-AA-1459
Short Caption:TYLER, THOMAS LEE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPT. OFClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/24/1987

Opening Event Date:12/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerThomas Lee NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
N. Denise Wilson-Taylor NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TYLER, THOMAS LEE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
12/24/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & MICHAEL L. MILWEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GREG PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD R
02/05/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD CHECK
02/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/12/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD DSA
03/02/1988LETTER REQUEST SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMO DUE 042088 JJ PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD
03/29/1988ORDER SS, CASE REMOVE FROM STLMNT CONF OF 4/27/88; BRF OF PETNR DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BA
03/31/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS OR TO MAY 1, 1988 RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 040888 SCHPRD BA
05/11/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050188 SCHPRD BA
05/12/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 052488 SCHPRD OPE
07/08/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 8, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD BE
08/26/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR RELEASE OF UNEMPLOYMENT FUNDS DUE TO THE PETITIONER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1988ORDER RESP TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FL BRF. VACATED PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BE
09/29/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF GT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/20/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD OPA
11/14/1988ORDER VACATE 9/20/88 ORD; CLERK TO SCHD FOR CONSIDERATION ASAP. AG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/11/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD