judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SALAMA, JOSEPH S. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE

Case Information: 87-AA-1394
Short Caption:SALAMA, JOSEPH S. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd of Medicine (BMED)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/09/1988

Opening Event Date:03/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/23/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/03/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/18/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJoseph S. Salama NPro SeN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Frances M. D'Antuono YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Susan S. Mcdonald YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SALAMA, JOSEPH S. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030988 ORD: GRANT MO FOR LV TO NOTE - 01 PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS & NOTE - 02 CLERK TO FL LODGED PTN FOR NOTE - 02 REVIEW & DOCKETING STATEMENT; NOTE - 03 RESPONDENT TO FL RECORD IN 15 NOTE - 03 DAYS; HOLD REQUEST FOR NOTE - 04 APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PENDNG NOTE - 04 FILING OF RECORD ON APPEAL. NOTE - 05 8/26/88 ORD: DENY MO OF PTNR NOTE - 05 FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANT REQ NOTE - 06 OF PTNR FOR APPMT OF COUNSEL & NOTE - 06 APPT FRANCES D'ANTUONO FOR NOTE - 07 PTNR; BRF OF PTNR DUE IN 40. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 4/17/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF PTNR NOTE - 08 FOR LV TO FL REQ FOR ARF & NOTE - 09 GRANT REQ FOR ARG; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 09 PTNR TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL & NOTE - 10 APRNC OF FRANCES D'ANTUONO IS NOTE - 10 WITHDRWN & CLK TO ENTR APPRNC NOTE - 11 OF RONALD GOODBREAD FOR APLT. NOTE - 11
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOODBREADR FOR - PETITIONER ATTY 2 - MCDONALDS FOR - RESPONDENT
01/01/1906 D'ANTUONOF PRO BONO
12/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/17/1987PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987RECEIVED PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD RBH
03/09/1988PETITION FOR REVIEW ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO MAINTAIN MEDI- CAL LICENSE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD R
03/31/1988RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION SEEKING REVERSAL, ETC MLH PANEL SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD OPE
06/06/1988RECEIVED REPLY OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION SEEKING REVERSAL, ETC. MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION SEEKING REVERSAL JB PANEL SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD CHECK
06/21/1988ORDER DENY MO OF PTNR TO MAINTAIN LICENSE;BRF OF PETNR DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELMKRO SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD TMC
06/28/1988MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF JUNE 21ST COUNT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RJG PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD OPE
07/14/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COUNSEL IS APPOINTED JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. DAS PANELMKRO SCDATE 071988 SCHPRD VS
10/05/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/14/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO FILE CLARIFYING STATEMENT (STATE- MENT INCLUDE IN BODY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/14/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CHECK
11/10/1988ORDER THAT THE CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE THE CLARIFYING STATEMENT OF RESPONDENT SL PANELRO SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD OPA
11/10/1988STATEMENT CLARIFYING STMT OF RESPONDENT RECVD WITHIN THE MO FOR LV TO FILE STMT DTD 10/6/88 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 24, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1988ORDER GRT PETITIONER MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/24/88-NFX PB PANELRO SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD V
12/23/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 2, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122488 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1989ORDER GRT PETITIONER MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/2/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD CHECK
02/02/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-6-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/6/89. ANY FUR REQ FOR AN EXT W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD N
03/06/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BA
03/20/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1989LETTER DATED 3/29/89 FROM APPELLANT PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989LETTER DATED 4/3/89 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IN 87-1347 IN RESPONSE TO LETTER 3/29/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989PETITIONER'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989ORDER GRT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF, PET'S BRIEF IS FILED AND RES. BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
04/25/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 26TH JB PANEL SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER SS, CASE STAYED PENDING DECI- SION IN 87-1347. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1989ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY ORDER ON APPEAL SHOULDN'T BE SUMMARILY AFFIRMED. MEH PANELMK SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD CHECK
08/11/1989PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 081189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1989ORDER APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER. MEH PANELBETE SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD VS
11/02/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 6, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110489 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1989ORDER GRANT RESP MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/06/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD V
12/05/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-13-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/03/1990RESPONDENT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
04/04/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT & TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-11. DAS PANELFETEGA SCDATE 041190 SCHPRD VS
04/18/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/18/1990ARGUED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV DECISION ON REVIEW /CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 578 A.2d 693
07/18/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1886
08/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD