judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FREDERICK III, CHRISTOPHER O. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION

Case Information: 87-AA-1326
Short Caption:FREDERICK III, CHRISTOPHER O. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Taxicab Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/04/1988

Opening Event Date:01/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/21/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChristopher Frederick NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FREDERICK III, CHRISTOPHER O. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/23/87 ORD: DENY PET'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO PROCEED IN F.P. FO NOTE - 02 THAT PET. W/I 10 DAYS SHALL NOTE - 02 REMIT THE $50 DKTG FEE OR THE NOTE - 03 PET FOR REVIEW AND DSA SHALL NOTE - 03 BE RETURNED FORTHWITH..
11/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/30/1987PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD DDW
01/04/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD PDDA
01/04/1988PETITION FOR REVIEW PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT TO FILE REC W/IN 15 DAYS. FVH PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD R
04/25/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BA
05/25/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 22, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/21/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 062288 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/23/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD