Case Information: 40754 | |||
Short Caption: | AIMAR VS. GUARANTEE TRUST LIFE INSURANCE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36850 , 37280 , 37739 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382863 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/04/2003 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Curran & Parry--check no. 11889. | ||
01/08/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-00390 | |
01/14/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 03-00728 | |
01/15/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 9/21/00 and NOE filed 9/26/00. Due Date: 10 days | ||
01/23/2003 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed in district court on September 21, 2000. | 03-01244 | |
01/23/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed in district court on September 26, 2000. | 03-01245 | |
01/24/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/24/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-01304 | |
01/28/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. David K. Robinson. (district court order and Docketing statement) | ||
04/03/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice to Reassign. | 03-05585 | |
04/04/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | ||
06/04/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 03-09380 | |
06/11/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 03-09689 | |
06/11/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |