judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVIDSON, LANING R. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE

Case Information: 87-AA-1347
Short Caption:DAVIDSON, LANING R. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd of Medicine (BMED)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/04/1987

Opening Event Date:12/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/14/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Cary M. Feldman YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Susan S. Mcdonald YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIDSON, LANING R. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/23/88 ORD: GRT PET'S MO FOR NOTE - 01 LV TO FILE DKTG STMT AND THE NOTE - 02 RECORD; CLK DIRTD TO FILE THE NOTE - 02 LODGED DKTG STMT AND RECORD. NOTE - 03 FO THAT PET'S BRIEF SHALL BE NOTE - 03 FILED W/I 40 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FELDMANC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCDONALDS FOR - APPELLEE
12/04/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AN ORDER OF THE D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY AND TO RECALL ORDER OF BOARD OF MEDICINE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1987RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY AND RECALL OF ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD OPE
12/23/1987ORDER DENYING MO FOR STAY. ACG PANELPYTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF MOTION FOR STAY & RECALL OF MANDATE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1988ORDER DENY MO TO RECONSIDER THE DENIAL OF HIS MO FOR STAY & RECALL OF ORDER. ACG PANELPYTE SCDATE 011388 SCHPRD VS
01/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/25/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL GREG PANEL SCDATE 122987 SCHPRD R
01/26/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD DSA
01/27/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD LODGED WITH THIS COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD N
02/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988LETTER REQUEST SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMO DUE 041188 JJ PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD
03/18/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO POSTPONE SETTLEMENT CONF OR TO EXT. TIME TO FILE APLT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF PETNR TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/2/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD OPE
04/08/1988APPELLEE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988APPELLANT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE UPON CONCLUSION OF SETLMNT CONF, BRF OF PETNR DUE BY 5/16/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF PETNR FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF PETNR; BRF OF RESP DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD V
06/20/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 22, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1989ARGUED PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1989LETTER DATED 3/29/89 FROM APPELLANT IN 87-1394 RE RULE 28(K) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989LETTER DATED 4/3/89, FROM APPELLANT, IN RESPONSE TO LETTER FROM R. GOODBREAD IN 87-1394 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 562 A.2d 109
07/13/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 1474
08/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD