judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WRIGHT, JOCELYN LYNETTE D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1346
Short Caption:WRIGHT, JOCELYN LYNETTE D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/04/1987

Opening Event Date:12/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/22/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJocelyn L. Wright NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Michael A. MilweeYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WRIGHT, JOCELYN LYNETTE D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/2/88 ORD: RECORD REMANDED NOTE - 01 FOR CONSIDERATION BY DOES ON NOTE - 02 THE EFFECT OF AN ATTEMPTED NOTE - 02 WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR NOTE - 03 RESIGNATION BY AN EMPLOYEE. NOTE - 03 FO THAT DOES FILE W/THIS COURT NOTE - 04 AN APPROPRIATELY MODIFIED NOTE - 04 DEC. UPON COMPLETION OF THE NOTE - 05 FURTH PROC. FO THAT THIS CT. NOTE - 05 SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OF NOTE - 06 THIS PROCEEDING DURING REMAND. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 2/28/90 ORD: DENY PETNR'S PRO NOTE - 07 SE MO. TO OVERTURN DECISION NOTE - 08 ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST FOR A NOTE - 08 NEW TRIAL OR HEARING NOTE - 09 (TREATED AS A MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTE - 09 TO FILE FOR EN BANC NOTE - 10 CONSIDERATION). NOTE - 10
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WRIGHTJO FOR - pro se ATTY 2 - MILWEEM FOR - RESPONDENT
12/04/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & MICHAEL A. MILWEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. DPET. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - PENDING DSA) PANEL SCDATE 122487 SCHPRD R
01/27/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD DSA
02/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1988PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD DSA
03/04/1988APPELLEE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988APPELLANT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM DEEMED BRIEF OF PETITIONER, PER 3/22/88 ORDER. DAS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO SUBSTITUTE AND FILE SETTLEMENT MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF PETNR & SETLMNT MEMO OF APLT DEEMED BA; BRF OF RESP DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/11/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/20/88 GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
05/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/20/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 052088 SCHPRD BE
05/24/1988PTNR MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988ORDER GRANT PRO SE MO OF PTNR TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF IN 5 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD Q
06/27/1988PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD RBA
09/12/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988ORDER GRANT PRO SE REQ OF PTNR FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/9/88 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091388 SCHPRD VS
11/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1988ARGUED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 6 SL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD RDEC
01/24/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 1/18/89, FROM DOES TO APPELLANT RE RE- MAND PROCEEDINGS MLR PANEL SCDATE 010289 SCHPRD CHECK
03/14/1989LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: DELAY IN CASE DECISION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989RECEIVED RESPONSE FROM APLE TO APLT RE: CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/14/89 PRO SE LTR OF PTNR TO DIVISION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/21/89 RESPONSE OF RESP TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 12/2/88 (COPY OF DECISION) MLR PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD ANSE
04/18/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) LETTER REGARDING APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 4/18/89 PRO SE LTR OF PTNR TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -GA CITE 560 A.2d 509
06/09/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - GA PAGE # - 1243
06/26/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO OVERTURN DECISION ALTERNATIVELY REQ. A NEW TRIAL OR HRG (PET FOR REHRG) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989ORDER DENIYNG PETITION FOR REHEARING SL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD VS
07/20/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) MOTION TO OVERTURN DECISION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR NEW TRIAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD CHECK
08/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989RECEIVED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989ORDER GRT PTNR'S MOTION AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED PET FOR REH EN BANC SL PANELRO SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989LETTER TO PETNR RETURNING THE PET FOR REH EN BANC RECVD 10/19/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 THRU 10 SL PANELEB SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD VS