judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ROBERT P. HUDOCK

Case Information: 87-BG-1105
Short Caption:IN RE: ROBERT P. HUDOCKClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/21/1987

Opening Event Date:09/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Leonard H. Becker NN
Michael S. Frisch YN
Thomas E. Flynn NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles R. Donnenfeld NN
John F. Wilson NN
RespondentRobert P. Hudock NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUDOCK, ROBERT P. IN THE MATTER OF
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100287 ORDER: BPR W/IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 01 TO RECOMMEND TO THIS CT W/IN NOTE - 02 30 DAYS WHETHER RECIPROCAL NOTE - 02 DISCIPLINE SHLD BE IMPOSED OR NOTE - 03 WHETHER THE BD ELECTS TO PRO- NOTE - 03 CEED de novo, PURSUANT TO RULE NOTE - 04 XI, sec. 7. NOTE - 04
09/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/21/1987NOTICE ORDER OF PUBLIC REPRIMAND FROM VA STATE BAR DISCIPLINARY BD. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101087 SCHPRD CHECK
12/07/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/07/1987REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. EBP PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DRR
01/21/1988ORDER RESPONDENT BY 2/22 OTSC PER RULE XI, 18(3), WHY RECIRPOCAL DIS SHLD NOT BE IMPOSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD RSE
06/09/1988MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED TO JJ NW/SC/RY PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/14/1988MISCELLANEOUS OPINION PUBLICLY REPRIMANDING RESPONDENT. (RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE) EBP PANELNWSCRY SCDATE 060988 SCHPRD RDEC
07/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - MIS METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 544 A.2d 707 PUBLIC REPRIMAND BY COURT
07/14/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1257