judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ROBERT T. CHANDLER

Case Information: 87-BG-1083
Short Caption:IN RE: ROBERT T. CHANDLERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/18/1987

Opening Event Date:09/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/03/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Leonard H. Becker NN
Michael S. Frisch YN
Thomas E. Flynn NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles R. Donnenfeld NN
J. Randolph Wilson NN
RespondentRobert T. Chandler NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHANDLER, ROBERT T. IN THE MATTER OF
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100287 ORDER: THAT BPR W/IN 30 NOTE - 01 DAYS TO RECOMMEND TO THIS CT NOTE - 02 WHETHER RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE NOTE - 02 SHLD BE IMPOSED OR WHETHER, NOTE - 03 INSTEAD THE BD ELECTS TO PRO- NOTE - 03 CEED de novo PURSUANT TO RULE NOTE - 04 XI, sec 7. NOTE - 04
09/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/18/1987NOTICE OF SUSPENSION FROM OREGON SUPREME CT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/03/1988REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. (RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE) EBP PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DRR
02/04/1988ORDER RESPONDENT BY 3/7/88 OTSC WHY RECOMMENDED DIS SHLD NOT BE IMPOSED RE: RULE XI, 18(3) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED TO JJ BE/ST/RY PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988SUSPENSION MOJ - SUSPENDING RESPONDENT FOR 63 DAYS EFFECTIVE IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELBESTRY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD RDEC
07/06/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - S METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE