judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: DALE E. DUNCAN

Case Information: 87-BG-0253
Short Caption:IN RE: DALE E. DUNCANClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Leonard H. Becker NN
Thomas E. Flynn NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles R. Donnenfeld NN
J. Randolph Wilson NN
RespondentDale E. Duncan N
Barry P. Steinberg NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DUNCAN, DALE E. IN THE MATTER OF
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 040687 ORDER: RESPONDENT W/IN NOTE - 01 15 DAYS OSTC WHY HE SHLD NOT NOTE - 02 BE SUSPENDED FROM THE PRACTICE NOTE - 02 OF LAW IN D.C. PURSUANT TO NOTE - 03 RULE XI, sec 15(1). NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 050187 ORDER: PURSUANT TO RULE NOTE - 04 XI, sec. 15(1) & (4), THAT NOTE - 05 RESPONDENT IS SUSPENDED FROM NOTE - 05 THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN D.C., & NOTE - 06 BPR IS DIRECTED TO INSTITUTE NOTE - 06 A FORMAL PROCEEDING FOR NOTE - 07 DETERMINATION OF THE NATURE OF NOTE - 07 THE FINAL DISCIPLINE TO BE NOTE - 08 IMPOSED, & SPECIFICALLY TO NOTE - 08 REVIEW THE ELEMENTS OF THE NOTE - 09 CRIME FOR WHICH RESPONDENT WAS NOTE - 09 SENTENCED FOR THE PURPOSE OF NOTE - 10 DETERMINING WHETHER OR NOT THE NOTE - 10 CRIME INVOLVES MORAL TURPITUDE NOTE - 11 WITHIN THE MEANING OF D.C. NOTE - 11 CODE 11-2503(a). CLK TO CAUSE NOTE - 12 A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO BE NOTE - 12 TRANSMITTED TO CHAIRMAN OF THE NOTE - 13 BPR & TO RESPONDENT THEREBY NOTE - 13 NOTIFYING HIM OF THIS ORDER OF NOTE - 14 SUSPENSION & OF THE PROVISIONS NOTE - 14 OF SEC. 19 OF RULE XI. NOTE - 15 011988 ORDER: THIS MATTER HELD NOTE - 15 IN ABEYANCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 16 RULE XI, sec. 15(4) UNTIL NOTE - 16 CONCLUSION OF ALL PENDING NOTE - 17 APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS CONCERN- NOTE - 17 ING RESPONDENT; FO: RESPONDENT NOTE - 18 & BAR COUNSEL TO INFORM THIS NOTE - 18 COURT PROMPTLY UPON THE CON- NOTE - 19 CLUSION OF PENDING APPELLATE NOTE - 19 PROCEEDINGS CONCERNING RESPON- NOTE - 20 DENT. NOTE - 20
01/13/1987RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO BPR'S REPORT & RECOMMENDATN EBP PANEL SCDATE 012987 SCHPRD RSE
02/27/1987NOTICE CERTIFIED COPY OF CONVICTION OF RESONDENT IN U.S. DISTR CT FOR DISTR OF VA. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040587 SCHPRD CHECK
05/01/1987SUSPENSION SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 14. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042187 SCHPRD ANS
05/01/1987DISP NO - 01 DISP - S METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
12/11/1987REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO REPORT & RECOMMENDATION. EBP PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD RSE
01/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 15 - 20. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1993STATEMENT of Bar Counsel re: status of conclusion of pending appeallate proceedings.
11/30/1993ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's report, it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to Bar Counsel for further proceedings under Sections 6 and 8 of D.C. App. R. XI. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the interim order of suspension entered on May 1, 1987 is hereby vacated. PER CURIAM (TE, SC, PY)
03/14/1994LETTER from office of Bar Counsel that Bar Counsel terminated the inquiry and dismissed the matter.
04/22/1994DISMISSED On consideration of the letter from Bar Counsel informing the Court that no reciprocal discipline be imposed, it is ORDERED that no reciprocal discipline be imposed and this matter is hereby dismissed. (FE)