Case: 14-09-00280-CR
14-09-00280-CR
03/26/2009
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Jeremy Wayne Myers
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/16/2009 | Case stored | | |||||
07/16/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
07/15/2009 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
06/22/2009 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
06/22/2009 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
06/05/2009 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
06/05/2009 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
06/04/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/25/2009 | Record due | | |||||
05/21/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/21/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||
05/20/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
05/20/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/05/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/05/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
03/26/2009 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |||||
03/26/2009 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
03/26/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
03/13/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/10/2009 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/16/2034 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Alan Curry |
Myers, Jeremy Wayne | PRO SE | Jeremy Wayne Myers |
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable JANICE M. KROCKER
1195492
3 years TDC