judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAY (PAUL) VS. STATE C/W 47078

Case Information: 46577
Short Caption:RAY (PAUL) VS. STATE C/W 47078Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:46577*, 47078 Related Case(s): 47078 , 54495
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190113Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/09/2007 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/09/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-00923
01/12/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/10/03, 11/25/03, 9/6/05, 9/7/05, 9/8/05, 9/9/05 and 12/1/05. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn, Joe D'Amato and Lisa Lizotte. Filed in district court on: January 9, 2006. 06-00924
02/08/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 09/07/05, 09/08/09, 09/10/05, and 12/01/05. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 06-02843
02/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 10, 2003. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 06-03143
02/24/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-04166
03/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 24, 2006. Rough Draft Transcript due: 10 days. FTS due 20 days after rough draft transcript is filed. 06-05324
03/24/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 25, 2003. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 06-06250
04/10/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 09/06/05 and 09/07/05. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 06-07491
05/10/2006MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 47078/46577. 06-09820
07/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motion to Consolidate. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file a single fast track statement and appendix. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-13969
07/28/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-15797) 06-15797
08/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Directing Full Briefing. These are consolidated appeals. The motion for an extension of time and for full briefing is granted. Opening brief and appendix due: 60 days. fn1[Transcripts have already been filed, but should either party object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts. If the necessary transcripts are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in the appendix.] Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-17015) 06-17015
10/19/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 2 day extension. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-21548
10/23/2006BriefReceived Opening Brief. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-21722
10/23/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 1 day. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-21774
10/24/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on October 23, 2006. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-21826) 06-21826
10/24/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-21722) 06-21722
10/24/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 4. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-21724) 06-21724
11/01/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Copy for document delivered to John C. Kelleher, Deputy Attorney General. Nos. 46577/47078. (06-22331) 06-22331
11/07/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/26/06. Court Reporter: Lisa a. Lizotte. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-22708
11/15/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 20, 2006. Nos. 46577/47078 06-23395
12/20/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 46577/47078. 06-26066
01/22/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 19, 2007. Nos. 46577/47078 (07-01636). 07-01636
02/22/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 46577/47078 07-04275
02/28/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due: 5 days. Nos. 46577/47078. 07-04780
03/02/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 46577/47078. 07-05068
03/02/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix, Volume V. Nos. 46577/47078. 07-05069
03/02/2007MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 46577/47078. 07-05070
03/06/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. requesting permission to file a supplemental appendix in these consolidated appeals. The appendix having been filed on March 2, 2007, the motion is denied as moot. Nos. 46577/47078. (07-05276) 07-05276
09/27/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 9, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. (NNP08G-MG/MC/NS) (Nos. 46577/47078) 07-21397
10/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (Nos. 46577/47078) 07-23387
11/09/2007MotionFiled Motion. for Leave Supplemental Appellant's Appendix (filed via fax). Nos. 46577/47078. DETACHED APPENDIX AND FILED PER ORDER OF 11/09/07. 07-24493
11/09/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of 11/9/07. The clerk shall detach 'Appellant's Supplemental Appendix, Volume V – Page 930' from appellant's motion and file it as a separate document. Nos. 46577/47078. 07-24497
11/09/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Appendix - Volumne V - Page 903. Nos. 46577/47078. Filed via fax. 07-24498
11/09/2007MotionFiled Motion. for Leave to File Supplemental Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 46577/47078 (Original). 07-24501
11/09/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume V - Page 930. Nos. 46577/47078 - (Original). 07-24503
11/09/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP08G-MG/MC/NS
01/29/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. Nos. 46577/47078. 08-02245
02/15/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 46577/47078. 08-03866
03/28/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 46577/47078. 08-07715
04/09/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 46577/47078. 08-08812
04/22/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-08076
04/22/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2008. 08-08076
05/07/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Nos. 46577/47078. 08-11404
08/12/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on July 30, 2008 and placed on the docket August 4, 2008 as Case No. 08-5602. Nos. 46577/47078. 08-20786
10/16/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. Nos. 46577/47078. 08-26682