judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLLINS, CHARLES M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1337
Short Caption:COLLINS, CHARLES M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/23/1987

Opening Event Date:12/23/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCharles M. Collins NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
N. Denise Wilson-Taylor NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLLINS, CHARLES M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERV. CRIME VICTIMS COMP. BRD
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/23/87 ORD: GRT PET'S MO FOR NOTE - 01 LV TO PROCEED IN F.P. AND CLK NOTE - 02 IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED PET. NOTE - 02 FOR REVIEW. FO THAT RESP. W/I NOTE - 03 15 DAYS TO CAUSE RECORD TO NOTE - 03 BE FILED W/THIS COURT.
11/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/30/1987PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW OF THE CRIME VICTIMS COMPENSATION BOARD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD DDW
12/23/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD R
01/27/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR STAY FILING OF THE RECORD UNTIL THE MOTION TO REMAND IS RULED ON RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HAVE CASE REMANDED RJG PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD OPA
03/10/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/10/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO REMAND & CASE REMANDED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD Q
03/10/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE