judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY WILLIAM GROOVER V. COA

Case Information: 87-BG-0279
Short Caption:GARY WILLIAM GROOVER V. COAClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/20/1987

Opening Event Date:03/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGary W. Groover NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Lloyd N. Moore NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GROOVER, GARY WILLIAM IN THE MATTER OF:
03/18/1987REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/02/1987ORDER APLICANT OTSC IN 20 DAYS WHY APPLICATION SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR HEARING EN BANC MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987ORDER BRIEFING STAYED PENDING DISPOSITION OF 86-1362, 87-92 & 87-93. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD OPE
03/10/1988ORDER APPLICANT'S BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS & COA'S BRIEF(S) DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD T
04/19/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 19TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD BA
05/09/1988ORDER GRANT APPLICANT'S MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 5/19/88-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD M
06/02/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF OR CASE SHALL BE SUBMTD ON THE COA'S REPORT ALONE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051988 SCHPRD BA
06/20/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL EBP PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD BA
06/27/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/27/1988ORDER GRANT APPLICANT'S MO & DISMISS APPEAL & WITHDRAWL APPLICATION FOR ADMISSIONS TO D.C. BAR.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD T
06/27/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE