judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENSON, FAY M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER &

Case Information: 87-AA-1321
Short Caption:HENSON, FAY M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER &Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Dept of Consumer & Regulatory Affairs (DCRA)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/27/1987

Opening Event Date:11/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/29/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/25/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
John J. McdermottNN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Gary C. AdlerYN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HENSON, FAY M. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER & REGULATORY AFFAIRS
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ADLERG FOR - PETITIONER ATTY 2 - BROOKINSC FOR - RESPONDENT
11/27/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AN ORDER OF THE D.C. DEPT. OF CONSUMER & REGULATORY AFFAIRS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD OPE
12/09/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO DISMISS THE MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987ORDER DENY MO FOR STAY W/O PREJUDICE ACG PANELPYTE SCDATE 112787 SCHPRD TMC
02/25/1988ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT TO FILE REC W/IN 15 DAYS. FVH PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD R
05/02/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
05/12/1988PETITIONER'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD BA
06/16/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 22ND JB PB PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD BE
07/22/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/22/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD BE
08/15/1988ORDER GRT RESPONDENT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/22/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD CHECK
08/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/22/1988RESPONDENT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BE
04/25/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/25/1989ARGUED PANELNWTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1989RECEIVED COPY OF JULY 24, 1987 AGENCY'S ORDER REQUEST AT ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 4/25/89 ORDER TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1989REVERSED JUDGMENT RV DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RV METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 560 A.2d 543
06/22/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1369
07/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD