judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREWS, CYNTHIA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1340
Short Caption:ANDREWS, CYNTHIA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/25/1988

Opening Event Date:01/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Alan S. GregoryNN
PetitionerCynthia Andrews NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ANDREWS, CYNTHIA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/25/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF PETNR NOTE - 01 & CLK TO FL LODGED PFR; GRANT NOTE - 02 MO'S OF RESP & CLK TO FL REC; NOTE - 02 BRF OF PETNR DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03 2/23/88 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/D NOTE - 03 APPRNC OF ALAN GREGORY AS NOTE - 04 COUNSEL FOR PETNR;PETNR TO NOTE - 04 INFORM CRT IN 20 DAYS OF NEW NOTE - 05 COUNSEL OR WILL PROCEED PRO SE NOTE - 05
01/01/1906 GREGORYA WITHDRAWN 2/23/88.
11/30/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD DSA
12/02/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & MICHAEL A. MILWEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO SUBSTITUTE TYPED PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S TYPED PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1987RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD TO 1/18/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD R
01/21/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1&2. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011388 SCHPRD X
01/25/1988PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988RECORD ON APPEAL DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ALAN S. GREGORY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD X
03/24/1988ORDER APLT IN 1O DAYS TO COMPLY WITH 2/23/88 ORDER OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD ANSA
04/14/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/14/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD ANSA
04/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
05/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD