Case Information: 46590 | |||
Short Caption: | SABERI VS. CAVIGLIA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45838 , 46140 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0207558 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/20/2006 / Frey, Nicholas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/13/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | ||
01/13/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger--check no. 021131. | ||
01/13/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-01018 | |
01/20/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Nicholas F. Frey . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/24/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 13, 2006. Nos. 45838/46140/46590-cases are not consolidated. | 06-01786 | |
01/30/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-02175 | |
04/03/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 12, 2006. Nos. 45838/46140/46590-cases are not consolidated. | 06-06966 | |
04/19/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 9, 2006. Nos. 45838/46140/46590-cases are not consolidated. | 06-08314 | |
06/26/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 45838/46140 (06-13223)/46590-case not consolidated. | 06-13224 | |
08/29/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 45838/46140 not consolidated w/46590. | 06-17933 | |
11/20/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 45838/46140 not consolidated w/46590. (06-23753) | 06-23755 | |
12/01/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Amended Settlement Conference Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 45838/46140/46590 - 46590 not consolidated with 45838 & 46140. | 06-24641 | |
12/15/2006 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Nos. 45838/46140 not consolidated w/46590. | 06-25722 | |
12/29/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 06-26687 | |
12/29/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |