Case: 96-0023
96-0023
01/10/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CYNTHIA WATSON HELLSTERN
CHANDRA PATTON Chairman of the REPUBLICAN PARTY OF ELLIS COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
01/12/1996 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Respondent | on behalf of Chandra Patton, Chairman | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/05/1996 | Case Stored | No Mo/Re filed | | |
01/16/1996 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | | |
01/12/1996 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | on behalf of Chandra Patton, Chairman | | |
01/10/1996 | Exhibits received | attached to petition | | |
01/10/1996 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
01/10/1996 | Petition for writ received | attached to m/l/f | | |
01/10/1996 | Request made for reply to proceeding | By Fri. 01/12/96 @ 12 noon!! Called and spoke to Ms. Patton herself!! | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/06/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 2H1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CARROLL, ROBERT | Other interested party | Mr. Robert J. Carroll |
PATTON, CHANDRA | Respondent | Ms. Chandra Patton Chairman |
Johnson, W. Lee | Other interested party | Mr. W. Lee Johnson |
BIGHAM, BRETT | Other interested party | Mr. Brett L. Bigham |
HELLSTERN, CYNTHIA WATSON | Relator | Ms. Cynthia Watson Hellstern |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information