judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Lorenzo Medrano v. The State of Texas

Case: 03-96-00041-CR
03-96-00041-CR
01/16/1996
Other Felony
Lorenzo Medrano
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/17/1998CASE STORED
04/07/1997Mandate Acknowledgment
02/04/1997Mandate Issued
10/02/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/25/1996Submitted
09/25/1996Submission
08/29/1996Submission
08/23/1996Brief filed
08/23/1996Case ready to be set
07/29/1996Frivolous brief filed
07/09/1996Supplemental Transcript filed
07/03/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/21/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/07/1996Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/17/1996Mt to Withdraw as attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/1996Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed
04/26/1996Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/25/1996Statement of Facts Filed
02/29/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/23/1996Transcript Filed
02/16/1996RECORD OVERDUE CRIMINAL
02/01/1996miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
02/01/1996Mot - Ext. time file NOA Disp.Dismissed
01/22/1996miscellaneous motion filed
01/22/1996Mot.- Ext. time file NOA
01/16/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
01/16/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Medrano, LorenzoAppellantMr. David K. Sergi
Lorenzo Medrano
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ronald Earle
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable L. L. Fuller
0944998
2 cts.-5 yrs. each count