judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AHMED, HAGOS D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION

Case Information: 87-AA-1341
Short Caption:AHMED, HAGOS D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Taxicab Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/01/1987

Opening Event Date:12/01/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Edward F. Kearney NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AHMED, HAGOS ET AL D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030888 ORDER: GRANT MO FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO FILE RECORDS IN 87-1324, NOTE - 02 87-1400 & 87-1424; FO: SS, CON NOTE - 02 87-1322, 87-1323, 87-1324, NOTE - 03 87-1341, 87-1400 & 87-1424 & NOTE - 03 APLE IN 15 DAYS TO FILE RECORD NOTE - 04 IN 87-1322, 87-1323 & 87-1341. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 06 5/13/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF PTNR NOTE - 06 TO SEVER 87-1341 FROM 87-1322, NOTE - 07 1323, 1324, 1400 & 1424; BRF NOTE - 07 OF PTNR IN 87-1341 DUE BY NOTE - 08 6/6/88; BRF OF RESP IN 87-1322 NOTE - 08 1323, 1324, 1400 & 1424 DUE NOTE - 09 BY 6/8/88. NOTE - 09
12/01/1987PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AN ORDER OF THE D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD CHARLES L. REISCHEL & ARRINGTON DIXON RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122487 SCHPRD R
03/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSCRIPT ATTACHED -- 167 PGS.) GT PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD R
03/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1988ORDER APLTS' BRIEFS DUE W/IN 4O DAYS EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD BA
04/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DECONSOLIDATE APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD OPE
05/19/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REMAND FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1988RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REMAND TO 10 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT ISSUES FINAL DECISION IN 87-211 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO STAY TM TO FL OPPO TO REMAND PENDG DISP PET REHRNG EN BANC IN 87-211. PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD Q
07/21/1988RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT DENYING MO FOR REMAND & GRANT MO FOR SUMM AFF; AFFRM DEC ON APPEAL. ACG PANELROFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
05/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD