Case: 05-04-00091-CV
05-04-00091-CV
01/22/2004
Summary Judgment
Kel Investors, Inc. d/b/a B.H. Construction and Boyd Allen Hobbs
CRS Commercial Roof Specialist, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/23/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/23/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/13/2004 | Letter Filed | | |
07/21/2004 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
06/29/2004 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
06/29/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
06/29/2004 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
06/28/2004 | Submission | | |
06/28/2004 | Submitted | | |
06/18/2004 | Record Returned | | |
06/18/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
06/16/2004 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed | | |
06/09/2004 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |
05/25/2004 | Brief Due | | |
05/17/2004 | Letter Filed | | |
04/25/2004 | Brief Due | | |
04/19/2004 | Order Entered | Mediation | |
03/31/2004 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
03/30/2004 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
03/30/2004 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
03/30/2004 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
03/30/2004 | Record Checked Out | | |
03/29/2004 | Docketing Statement Due | | |
03/26/2004 | Case reinstated | | |
03/26/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/26/2004 | Order Entered | Vacated | |
03/26/2004 | Case reinstated | | |
03/22/2004 | Record due | | |
03/05/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
03/05/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/05/2004 | Notice Filed | | |
03/02/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
02/23/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
02/23/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
02/23/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
02/22/2004 | Submission | | |
02/22/2004 | Submitted | | |
01/26/2004 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
01/26/2004 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
01/22/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/22/2004 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/21/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/29/2003 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/28/2010 | Status | Destroy record |
09/23/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Crs Commercial Roof Specialist | Appellee | Robert T. Miller, Jr. |
Kel Investors, Inc. | Appellant | Marshal W. Dooley |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
CC-03-5618-D