Case Information: 46582 | |||
Short Caption: | BURKS, II (ELMER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR050958 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/13/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/13/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-00953 | |
01/13/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: October 17, 18 and 19, 2005 and December 6, 2005. Court Reporters: M. Hoenshell, P. Hoogs and M. Terry. Filed in district court on: January 5, 2006. | 06-00954 | |
01/13/2006 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 11, 2006. | 06-00970 | |
01/31/2006 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/17/05, 10/18/05, 10/19/05, and 12/06/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs & Associates. | 06-02307 | |
02/23/2006 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 1, 2006. | 06-03974 | |
03/03/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 06-04809 | |
03/09/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. filed on March 3, 2006. Appellant has not demonstrated extreme need or merit, and the motion is denied. Fast track statement and appendix due: 15 days. | 06-05217 | |
03/17/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-05782 | |
03/17/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 06-05783 | |
04/07/2006 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: April 13, 2006. | 06-07412 | |
04/14/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-07882 | |
06/12/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-12286 | |
07/07/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-12384 | |
07/07/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2006. | 06-12384 |