judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BATTLE, LEROY D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 87-AA-1325
Short Caption:BATTLE, LEROY D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/30/1987

Opening Event Date:11/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLeroy Battle NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BATTLE, LEROY D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
11/30/1987PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1987CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & MICHAEL A. MILWEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD R
01/27/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD DSA
03/07/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/07/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. (NO DOCKET STATE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD DSA
03/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD