judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

L. M. BURCHFIELD, ET AL. v. K. L. TANNER

Case: A-29
A-29
01/12/1944
Application for Writ of Error
L. M. BURCHFIELD, ET AL.
K. L. TANNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/04/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/12/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1944Response to Motion filed
03/20/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1944Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
02/04/1944Brief on the Merits
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/12/1944Response to Petition
01/12/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/12/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
K. L. TannerRespondent
L. M. Burchfield, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information