judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEJOHN DOHAWK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0862
Short Caption:DEJOHN DOHAWK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM887-10Filed Date:07/09/2010

Opening Event Date:07/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDejohn Dohawk Y
Cedric D. MillerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric Miller, Esquire, si hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric Miller, Esquire
08/25/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (97pgs/Tape) 6/24/10 proc.
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12pgs/Tape) 7/8/10 proc. w/CD included
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 15, 2010 (no oppo)
10/14/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 15, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/15/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until December 5, 2010 (no oppo)
11/30/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 6, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 5, 2011 (no oppo)
12/20/2010ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/07/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE with CD attached
04/08/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/attachment (no oppo)
04/11/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to supplement record
06/27/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall fie the VIDEOTAPES introduced at trial as a supplemental record on appeal. It is ***MORE***
06/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 - VIDEOTAPES FROM TRIAL
06/27/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED as to the first assault and the latter count merges w/the former assault count...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
06/27/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the case IS REMANDED to the Superior Court to vacate a single assault conviction. Since the sentences for both counts were concurrent, there is no need for re-sentencing. (GLRDTE)
07/19/2011FiledMandate