Case: 02-09-00010-CV
02-09-00010-CV
01/08/2009
Miscellaneous civil
Lease Finance Group, LLC
Randy Childers, Arlington Motor Cars USA, and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/18/2009 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
04/30/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
03/12/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||||
03/18/2010 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||||
03/18/2010 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||||||
06/03/2009 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/18/2009 | Reply brief filed | | |||||||
05/05/2009 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||||
04/30/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
04/30/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
04/20/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||||
04/09/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/09/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
03/12/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
02/11/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||||
02/10/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
01/29/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
01/22/2009 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
01/08/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/27/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lease Finance Corporation | Appellant | Mark C. Snyder |
Arlington Motor Cars USA | Appellee | Franklin W. Cram |
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. | Appellee | Truman E. Spring Jr. |
Childers, Randy | Appellee | Franklin W. Cram |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. Brent Keis
08-66125-1