judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FORD (BOBBY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34752
Short Caption:FORD (BOBBY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C129299Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/01/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08165
10/04/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings:June 28, 1999, August 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-09510
10/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned, unfiled the original and three copies of the docketing statement.
10/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10233
10/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled the original and four copies of the docketing statement.
10/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due: 10 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall also, within 10 days of the date of this order, file either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. fn1[Appellant need not request transcripts of proceedings held on June 28, 1999 and August 4, 1999 again]. 99-10552
11/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Allow Late Filing of Docketing Statement. 99-11339
12/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Allow Late Filing of Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12681
12/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The docketing statement provisionally received on November 15, 1999, and the certificate of no transcript request provisionally received on December 15, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-12745
12/16/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11258
12/16/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12682
12/30/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 31, 2000. 99-13403
01/31/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 1/29/00. 00-01565
01/31/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. 00-01566
01/31/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-01571
03/02/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-03343
03/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-03344
03/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 31, 2000, appellant filed a motion seeking leave to supplement the record on appeal. We deny appellant's motion. Appellant may seek leave to file a supplemental appendix. 00-04535
05/01/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " We ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-08102
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08126
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08126