Case Heading (06-289) | |||||
Case Number: | 06-289 | Case Docketed On: | 12/26/2006 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901 | ||
Short Title: | WILLIAM ODELL MABE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | WILLIAM ODELL MABE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | William Odell Mabe | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Donna D. Domonkos |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Patrick J. Crank Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Ursula P. Schultz |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | 2007 WY 172 |
Citation: | 169 P.3d 870 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/26/2006 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/26/2006 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/26/2006 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/09/2007 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/14/2007 | Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
03/28/2007 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
03/29/2007 | Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
05/14/2007 | Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/20/2007 | Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/22/2007 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
07/09/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/10/2007 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
07/12/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folders; Volume IV, exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/12/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Record filed | Notice-Outgoing | Record filed | Final | |
10/31/2007 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
11/16/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
11/16/2007 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
11/16/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
11/16/2007 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
11/21/2007 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/20/07 Roger Calkins. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |