judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC V. WEAVER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0852
Short Caption:ERIC V. WEAVER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 10-CF-0637 Consolidated:10-CF-0852, 10-CO-1155
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-20268-09Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/04/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Weaver Y
Robert H. HollanderYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 10-CF-852 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CF-609 and 10-CF-637 for all purposes herein. F/O that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Eric Weaver in appeal no. 10-CF-852. F/O that counsel for appellant Eric Weaver shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert Hollander, Esquire
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (74 pgs/Coney) 4/12/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (74-181 pgs/Coney) 4/13/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (182-359 pgs/Coney) 4/14/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (77 pgs/Rogers) 4/15/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (122 pgs/Ronan) 4/19/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (26 pgs/Ronan) 4/20/10 proc.
08/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (15 pgs/tape) 4/23/10 proc. CD attached
08/12/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-609)
08/12/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-609)
08/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (SEALED---pleading)
08/13/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-637)
08/13/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-637)
08/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (WEAVER (pii)) (RT ordered/needed)
08/26/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-852)
08/26/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-852)
09/23/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEAL no. 10-CO-1155 with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CF-609, 10-CF-637 and 10-CF-852 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1155. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1155)
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1155)
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (15 pgs/tape) 2/1/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (31 pgs/tape) 2/19/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (10 pgs/tape) 3/26/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (8 pgs/tape) 4/12/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (102 pgs/Coney) 4/15/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (17 pgs/tape) 6/24/10 proc.
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (15 pgs/tape) 12/9/10 proc. w/cd
11/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 90 days (SHORT)
12/27/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Shorter)no oppo 30 days
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Weaver)
12/28/2010APPENDIX (Weaver)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF by 60 days (D. Shorter)(unopposed)
01/11/2011 On consideration of appellant Leonard Delonte Short's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the brief, and the unopposed motion of appellant Dwayne A. Shorter for extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Short is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Shorter is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 27, 2011. (Castillo)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (D. Shorter)
01/21/2011APPENDIX - Attached to Brief (D. Shorter)
03/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (L. Short) (no oppo)dwm
04/06/2011 On consideration of appellant Leonard Short's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that appellant Leonard Short's motion is granted and appellant Leonard Short's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions oftime will be looked upon with disfavor and grantedonly upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (short) no oppo 90 days
07/06/2011 On consideration of appellant Leonard Delonte Short's motion for an extension of time w/in which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Short is granted and the brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 26, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW)
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 30 days (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Short's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 10/26/11.
10/07/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - w/waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
10/17/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant Leonard Short's motion to dismiss appeal no. 10-cf-609 and these appeals are hereby severed, brief of appellee due w/in 30 days.
11/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/28/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Shorter) (Appellant)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/04/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, King Marc L. Resnick, Esq. for appellant Dineen A. Baker, Esq. for appellee
04/09/2012FiledMotion To Submit Without Oral Argument (Weaver) (Appellant)Granted
04/25/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt Weaver's motion to submit on briefs.
04/26/2012FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate