judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

A. M. FERGUSON v. CAREY E. PARKER

Case: A-41
A-41
01/19/1944
Application for Writ of Error
A. M. FERGUSON
CAREY E. PARKER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/26/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/17/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/22/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/19/1944Letter brief Petitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/26/1944Brief in Support of Petition
02/17/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/04/1944Letter Filed
01/22/1944Response to Petition
01/20/1944Brief in Support of Petition
01/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Letter brief
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. M. FergusonPetitioner
Carey E. ParkerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information